EP0579913 - Device for coupling an auxilliary unit to a reciprocating-piston engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wacker, Bernd Lerchenweg 27 W-7251Weissach / DE | [1994/04] | Application number, filing date | 93107446.2 | 07.05.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | DE19924224287 | 23.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224287 | [1994/13] |
Former [1994/04] | deleted | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579913 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579913 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/28, B60K25/06 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
B60K17/28 (EP);
B60K25/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Kuppeln eines Nebenaggregats mit einem Hubkolbenmotor | [1994/04] | English: | Device for coupling an auxilliary unit to a reciprocating-piston engine | [1994/04] | French: | Dispositif pour l'embrayage d'un agrégat auxiliaire avec un moteur à pistons | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 20.01.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2142101 (CASE POCLAIN CORP LTD); | [A]GB2168015 (ROSENBAUER KG KONRAD); | [AD]US3041884 (ELFES LEE E) |