EP0569957 - Screwed connection for hollow plastic profile members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pax GmbH Gewerbegebiet Rüsterbaum, Vorderer Böhl 39 D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states PaX GmbH Gewerbegebiet Rüsterbaum, Vorderer Böhl 39 D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states PAX SCHWEIKHARD GmbH Gewerbegebiet Rüsterbaum, Vorderer Böhl 39 D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alt, Albert Weiherheck 2a W-5509 Malborn / DE | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Eichler, Peter, et al Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Brahmsstrasse 29 42289 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1994/49] | Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 20 18 31 D-42218 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1993/46] | Sturies, Herbert Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Herbert Sturies Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler Postfach 20 18 31 D-42218 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107700.2 | 12.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | DE19920006646U | 15.05.1992 Original published format: DE 9206646 U | [1993/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569957 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569957 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/968 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
E06B3/9642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Schraubverbindung von Kunststoff-Hohlprofilen | [1993/46] | English: | Screwed connection for hollow plastic profile members | [1993/46] | French: | Accouplement vissé pour profilés creux en matière plastique | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 07.11.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.1996
06.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBE Vertriebsgesellschaft für Kunststoffprodukte GmbH Merzinger Str. 80 66763 Dillingen / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerbes, Margot Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger Patentanwälte Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78 53225 Bonn / DE | 02
31.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE VEKA AG Dieselstrasse 8 D-48324 Sendenhorst / DE Opponent's representative Meldau, Gustav Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.1996
06.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBE Vertriebsgesellschaft für Kunststoffprodukte GmbH Merzinger Str. 80 66763 Dillingen / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerbes, Margot Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger Patentanwälte Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78 53225 Bonn / DE | ||
02
31.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE VEKA AG Dieselstrasse 8 D-48324 Sendenhorst / DE Opponent's representative Meldau, Gustav Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | |||
Former [1996/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBE Vertriebsgesellschaft für Kunststoffprodukte GmbH Merzinger Str. 80 66763 Dillingen / DE Opponent's representative Müller-Gerbes, Margot Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger Patentanwälte Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78 53225 Bonn / DE | 05.09.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.05.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.04.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/31] | Appeal following opposition | 03.02.1998 | Appeal received No. T0129/98 | 03.02.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.04.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 21.04.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 02.11.1995 | |
LI | 02.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2634753 (DUERRSCHNABEL KARL); | [A]BE894520 (PROFEL N V); | [A]DE3236460 (GARTNER & CO J [DE]); | [Y]DE3327547 (GROTEMEYER GMBH & CO GEB [DE]); | [A]EP0149686 (KARLSTADTER FENSTER ELEMENTBAU [DE]); | [Y]DE8531890U |