EP0572833 - Energy absorbing, water blown, rigid polyurethane foam and methods of preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 8 Campus Drive Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 8 Campus Drive Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossio, Richard C. 1732 Lakewood Troy, MI 48083 / US | 02 /
Jackson, Michael Lon 15241 Regina Allen Park, MI 48101 / US | 03 /
Easterle, Mark Alan 147 Lysander Rochester, MI 48307 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Langfinger, Klaus Dieter, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Langfinger, Klaus-Dieter, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107772.1 | 13.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920894034 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: US 894034 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572833 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572833 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/66 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C08G18/3203 (EP,US);
C08G18/4072 (EP,US);
C08G18/4883 (EP,US);
C08G18/65 (EP,US);
C08G18/6517 (EP,US);
C08G18/6558 (EP,US);
C08G18/6677 (EP,US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0058 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0083 (EP,US);
C08G2120/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/49] | Title | German: | Energieabsorbierender, mit Wasser geblasener Polyurethanhartschaum und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1993/49] | English: | Energy absorbing, water blown, rigid polyurethane foam and methods of preparing same | [1993/49] | French: | Mousses rigides de polyuréthane absorbant de l'énergie gonflées par de l'eau et procédés pour leur préparation | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56000816 ; | [A]GB1065590 (ALLIED CHEM); | [AD]DE2527399 (MCCORD CORP); | [AD]US4212954 (NOMURA TAKAO [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0316788 (BASF CORP [US]); | [X]EP0437787 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP]WO9212197 (BASF CORP [US]); | [E]US5232957 (PRITCHARD JAMES R [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 11, June 1981, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 176158n, 'IMPACT-ENERGY ABSORBING URETHANE FOAMS' page 48 ;column 1 ; & JP-A-56 000 816 (KOHKOKU CHEMICAL), & JP56000816 A 00000000 |