blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0573808

EP0573808 - Force measuring arrangement for test bench [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/50]Force tranducer
[1997/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.1998
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.09.1998 [1998/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOFMANN WERKSTATT-TECHNIK GMBH
Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 2
D-64319 Pfungstadt / DE
[1993/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Merg, Burkhard
August-Bebel-Strasse 14
W-6101 Bickenbach / DE
[1993/50]
Representative(s)Nöth, Heinz
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/50]Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt, Mozartstrasse 17
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date93107837.213.05.1993
[1993/50]
Priority number, dateDE1992421913811.06.1992         Original published format: DE 4219138
[1993/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0573808
Date:15.12.1993
Language:DE
[1993/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0573808
Date:19.01.1994
Language:DE
[1994/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0573808
Date:10.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:G01L1/22
[1993/50]
CPC:
G01L1/2281 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/11]
Former [1993/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftmesseinrichtung für einen Kraftfahrzeugprüfstand[1997/37]
English:Force measuring arrangement for test bench[1997/37]
French:Dispositif de mesure de force pour banc d'essai[1997/37]
Former [1993/50]Kraftmesswandler
Former [1993/50]Force tranducer
Former [1993/50]Transducteur de force
Examination procedure14.06.1993Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.09.1993Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL
04.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/18]
06.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.03.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.1997Fee for grant paid
21.05.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.06.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.07.1993AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.1993
19.07.1993FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.1993
19.07.1993GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.1993
19.07.1993GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.1993
19.07.1993LI   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1993SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3528510  (HOTTINGER BALDWIN) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 28; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,15;
 [Y]JPS61209332  ;
 [A]JPS55155253
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870205), vol. 11, no. 40, Database accession no. (P - 544)<2487> , & JP61209332 A 19860917 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO.) [Y] 6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - F. HEINTZ, E.A., "EINSATZMöGLICHKEITEN UND ZUKUNFTSCHANCEN "INTELLIGENTER" SENSOREN IM KRAFTFAHRZEUG", BOSCH TECHNISCHE BERICHTE, STUTTGART DE, (199010), no. 52, pages 30 - 41, XP000177040 [Y] 15 * page 39, column R, paragraph L *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810227), vol. 5, no. 32, Database accession no. (P - 50)<704> , & JP55155253 A 19801203 (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0083568
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.