EP0570007 - Automatic coil winder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTOKU ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA 17-2, Bijogi 5-chome Toda-shi Saitama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states NITTOKU ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA 17-2, Bijogi 5-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yano, Fumiharu, c/o Nittoku Engineering K.K. 17-2, Bijogi 5-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107891.9 | 14.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | JP19920123662 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: JP 12366292 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0570007 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0570007 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570007 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/06 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
H01F41/076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Automatische Spulenwickelmaschine | [1993/46] | English: | Automatic coil winder | [1993/46] | French: | Bobineuse automatique | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.09.1996 | FR | 18.09.1996 | IT | 18.09.1996 | LI | 18.09.1996 | NL | 18.09.1996 | SE | 18.12.1996 | DE | 19.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | CH | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
LI | 18.09.1996 | ||
NL | 18.09.1996 | ||
SE | 18.12.1996 | ||
DE | 19.12.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
LI | 18.09.1996 | ||
SE | 18.12.1996 | ||
DE | 19.12.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 18.09.1996 | |
LI | 18.09.1996 | ||
SE | 18.12.1996 | ||
DE | 19.12.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | SE | 18.12.1996 | |
DE | 19.12.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 18.12.1996 | |
DE | 19.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | DE | 19.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3865152 (CAMARDELLA GIUSEPPE) [X] 1,4 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 16 * * column 7, line 18 - line 24 *; | [DA]JPH0218915 ; | [A]US4809917 (TSUCHIYA MINORU [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 42 - column 8, line 4 *; | [A]US3306554 (HENDERSON CLIFFORD W); | [A]JPH0236507 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900328), vol. 14, no. 161, Database accession no. (E - 909), & JP02018915 A 19900123 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [DA] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900416), vol. 14, no. 187, Database accession no. (E - 917)<4130>, & JP02036507 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [A] * abstract * |