Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2747167B | Global Dossier | 06.05.1998 | B2 | JPH05326312 | 10.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12366292 | 15.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0570007 | Global Dossier | 18.09.1996 | B1 | EP0570007 | 12.01.1994 | A3 | EP0570007 | 18.11.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP12366292 | 15.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69304784D1 | 24.10.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP12366292 | 15.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5397070 | 14.03.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12366292 | 15.05.1992 |