EP0571857 - Thiosemicarbazides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heuer, Lutz, Dr. Scheibler Strasse 83 W-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Kugler, Martin, Dr. Am Kloster 47 W-5653 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
Paulus, Wilfried, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 40 W-4150 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Lorentzen, Jens-Peter, Dr. An der Ruthen 2 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 05 /
Dehne, Heinz-Wilhelm, dr. Krischerstrasse 81 W-4019 Monheim / DE | 06 /
Erdelen, Christoph, Dr. Unterbüscherhof 22 W-5653 Leichlingen / DE | [1993/48] | Application number, filing date | 93107998.2 | 17.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | DE19924217723 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4217723 | [1993/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571857 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/42, C07D295/195, C07D413/12, A01N47/24, A01N47/34 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
C07D213/42 (EP);
C07D213/74 (KR);
A01N47/24 (EP);
A01N47/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/48] | Title | German: | Thiosemicarbazide | [1993/48] | English: | Thiosemicarbazides | [1993/48] | French: | Thiosemicarbazides | [1993/48] | File destroyed: | 05.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/09] | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO8504333 (CHEMINOVA AS [DK]) | [X] - PESTIC. SCI. Bd. 30, 1990, Seiten 223 - 233 'Chitin Biosynthesis Inhibition and fungicidal effect of thiosemicarbazones of 2-formyl and 2-acetylpyridinetheir hydrogenated derivatives and copper complexes thereof.' | [X] - EXPERIENTIA Bd. 45, Nr. 6, 1989Seiten 580 - 583 'Arylpyridyl-thiosemicarbazones: A new class of anti-juvenile hormones active against Lepidoptera' | [A] - ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH Bd. 6, Nr. 4, 1986, Seiten 197 - 222 'Thiosemicarbazones of 2-acetylpyridine, 2-acetylquinoline1-acetylisoquinoline and related compounds as inhibitors of herpes simplex virus in vitro and in a cutaneous herpes guinea pig model.' | [Y] - JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY Bd. 31, Nr. 4, 1983Seiten 713 - 718 '2-Acetylpyridine Thiosemicarbazones as inhibitors of Ecdysis in Oncopeltus fasciatus: Structure-Activity Relationship study' |