EP0580975 - Apparatus for generating the nozzle touching force by which the nozzle of a plasticising and injection unit driven by a srew is applied to the fixed mould half [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferromatik Milacron Maschinenbau GmbH Riegeler Strasse 4 D-79364 Malterdingen / DE | [1996/26] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states Ferromatik Milacron Maschinenbau GmbH Riegeler Strasse 4 D-79364 Malterdingen / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Klöckner Ferromatik Desma GmbH Riegeler Strasse 4 D-79364 Malterdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keitel, Ralph, Dipl.-Ing. Mechthildisstrasse 1 W-7832 Kenzingen / DE | 02 /
Stillhard, Bruno Huebstrasse 7 CH-9011 St. Gallen / CH | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Röther, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Brundert & Röther Kolkmannskamp 6 44879 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Röther, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt Vor dem Tore 16a D-47279 Duisburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | Röther, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Vor dem Tore 16a D-47279 Duisburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108051.9 | 18.05.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | DE19924219081 | 11.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4219081 | DE19924232533 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4232533 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580975 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580975 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/17 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B29C45/1777 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1994/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen der Düsenanlagekraft, mit der eine Düse eines von einem Spindelantrieb angetriebenen Plastifizier- und Einspritzaggregats gegen die auf die feststehende Formaufspannplatte aufgespannte Formhälfte ansteht | [1994/05] | English: | Apparatus for generating the nozzle touching force by which the nozzle of a plasticising and injection unit driven by a srew is applied to the fixed mould half | [1994/05] | French: | Dispositif pour générer la force de contact de brise par laquelle la brise d'une unité de plastification et d'injection entraînée par une vis est appliquée contre la moitié de moule fixe | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63056419 ; | [A]JP62073921 ; | [A]JP60259419 ; | [A]EP0193617 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0328671 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 274 (M-725)(3121) 29. Juli 1988 & JP-A-63 056 419 ( FANUC ), & JP63056419 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 269 (M-621)(2716) 2. September 1987 & JP-A-62 073 921 ( NISSEI PLASTICS ), & JP62073921 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 134 (M-479)(2191) 17. Mai 1986 & JP-A-60 259 419 ( FANUC ), & JP60259419 A 00000000 |