blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0571880

EP0571880 - Thermostable ligase from Archeobacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.1997
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.1997Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.1997 [1997/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/48]For all designated states
BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH
D-68298 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kletzin, Arnulf, Dr.
Agnes-Bernauer-Strasse 172
W-8000 München 21 / DE
02 / Rüger, Rüdiger, Dr.
Tutzinger Strasse 2
W-8124 Seeshaupt / DE
03 / Kessler, Christoph, Dr.
Schlossbergweg 11
W-8021 Dorfen / DE
04 / Kaletta, Cortina, Dr.
Seehauserstrasse 14
W-8000 München 70 / DE
05 / Jarsch, Michael, Dr.
Unterkarpfensee 11
W-8173 Bad Heilbrunn / DE
[1993/48]
Application number, filing date93108104.618.05.1993
[1993/48]
Priority number, dateDE1992421713423.05.1992         Original published format: DE 4217134
[1993/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0571880
Date:01.12.1993
Language:DE
[1993/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1993
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/00, C12Q1/68, C12N15/52
[1993/48]
CPC:
C12N9/93 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/48]
TitleGerman:Thermostabile Ligase aus Archaebakterien[1993/48]
English:Thermostable ligase from Archeobacteria[1993/48]
French:Ligase thermostable d'Archeobacteria[1993/48]
Examination procedure18.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/48]
02.12.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/24]
16.01.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1997/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199604   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO9117239  ;
 [A]WO8705907
 [XO]  - BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY SYMPOSIA Bd. 58, 1992, LONDON Seiten 149 - 169 DANSON, M. J., D. W. HOUGH AND G. G. LUNT (ED. 'THE ARCHAEBACTERIA: BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY'
 [AD]  - FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS Bd. 75, Nr. 2-3, 1990, AMSTERDAM NL Seiten 117 - 124 Stetter K O; Fiala G; Huber G; Huber R; Segerer A 'Hyperthermophilic microorganisms - hyper-thermophilic bacterium taxonomy; review'
 [T]  - ADVANCES IN BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING/BIOTECHNOLOGY Bd. 45, 1992, BERLIN DE Seiten 57 - 98 COOLBEAR T; DANIEL RM; MORGAN HW 'The enzymes from extreme thermophiles: bacterial sources, thermostabilities and industrial relevance.'
 [A]  - BIOSIS PREVIEWS DATABASE,Philadelphia, Ab.No.87107948 KLETZIN A 'COUPLED ENZYMATIC PRODUCTION...'
 [XP]  - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH Bd. 20, Nr. 20, 1992, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US Seiten 5389 - 5396 Kletzin A. 'Molecular characterisation of a DNA ligase gene of the extremely thermophilic archaeon Desulfurolobus ambivalens shows close phylogenetic relationship to eukaryotic ligases'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.