EP0572890 - Optical demultiplexing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | ||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavaciuti, Alessandro Via a. Sismonda, 10/3 Torino / IT | 02 /
Puleo, Mario Via Fenera, 1 Borgosesia (VC) / IT | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton, et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer, Postfach 26 64 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108342.2 | 24.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | IT1992TO00443 | 26.05.1992 Original published format: IT TO920443 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572890 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572890 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/08, H01S3/25 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
H04J14/08 (EP,US);
H01S5/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Optische Demultiplexieranordnung | [1993/49] | English: | Optical demultiplexing system | [1993/49] | French: | Système optique de démultiplexage | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Appeal following examination | 18.10.1996 | Appeal received No. T0211/97 | 20.12.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.10.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 22.10.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0419720 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - IEE PROCEEDINGS J. OPTOELECTRONICS vol. 139, no. 2, 1 April 1992, STEVENAGE GB pages 93 - 110 NOMEN NESCIO 'Crosstalk reduction in semiconductor laseramplifier' | [A] - ELECTRONIC LETTERS vol. 23, no. 8, 9 April 1987, HITCHIN (UK) pages 396 - 397 T. MUKAI ET AL. 'Signal gain saturation in two-channel common amplification using a 1.5 microm. InGaAsP travelling wave laser amplifier' | Examination | - ELECTRONIC LETTERS, 23rd May 1991, Vol. 27 No. 11, P. 922-924 |