EP0626753 - Control device for induction motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Satou, Nobuyasu 11-3-501, Minamifujisawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states Satou, Nobuyasu 11-3-501, Minamifujisawa Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Ewald Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Oppermann, Ewald, Dipl.-Ing. Am Wiesengrund 35 D-63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108408.1 | 25.05.1993 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626753 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626753 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/628 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
H02P27/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/48] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für einen Induktionsmotor | [1994/48] | English: | Control device for induction motor | [1994/48] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un moteur à induction | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59159695 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 10 (E-290)17 January 1985 & JP-A-59 159 695 ( MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K. ) 10 September 1984, & JP59159695 A 19840910 | [A] - GASTLI A., NOBUYUKI MATSUI, "V/F PWM INVERTER WITH MOTOR PARAMETER IDENTIFICATION AND VOLTAGE AUTO-BOOST CAPABILITIES.", SIGNAL PROCESSING AND SYSTEM CONTROL, FACTORY AUTOMATION. PACIFIC GROVE, NOV. 27 - 30, 1990., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19901127), vol. 02., doi:10.1109/IECON.1990.149259, ISBN 978-0-87942-600-2, pages 903 - 908., XP000216827 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1990.149259 |