EP0589145 - Shift control system for manually shiftable automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states AISHIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states AISHIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabata, Atsushi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Hojo, Yasuo c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Okada, Takayuki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Kaigawa, Masato c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Taga, Yutaka c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Hattori, Masashi c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 07 /
Inuzuka, Takeshi c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 08 /
Takeshita, Yoshito c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 09 /
Takeda, Tsutae c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 10 /
Wakasugi, Takanori c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 11 /
Suzuki, Kazuyuki c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 12 /
Inaba, Masahito c/o Aishin AW Co., Ltd., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108485.9 | 26.05.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | JP19920274792 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: JP 27479292 | JP19920274793 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: JP 27479392 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0589145 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0589145 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589145 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H59/02 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
F16H61/16 (EP,US);
F16H59/0204 (EP,US);
F16H2059/006 (EP,US);
F16H59/044 (EP,US);
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
F16H59/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Gangwechsel - Steuersystem für von Hand schaltbares automatisches Getriebe | [1994/13] | English: | Shift control system for manually shiftable automatic transmission | [1994/13] | French: | Système de commande de changement de vitesses pour transmission automatique où les vitesses peuvent être changées manuellement | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4042045 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 9 - column 11; figures 3-6 * * column 21 - column 24; figures 17,18 * [A] 7,8; | [XA]US3465612 (LETWIN BRUCE K, et al) [X] 1 * column 3 - column 5; figure 1 * [A] 2,20,21; | [E]DE4324333 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [E] 1,2,8,3-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0122014 (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 8; figure 6 *; | [DA]US5056376 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2 * column A; figure 1 * [A] 3-5,11,22; | [DA]US5062314 (MAIER ULRICH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [XA]US3726094 (SCHAEFER R) [X] 3-5,14 * the whole document * [A] 11,22; | [X]US4765202 (HAYASAKI KOICHI [JP]) [X] 9,10 * column A; figure 3 *; | [A]US5010788 (SUGANO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 9,10 * column A *; | [X]US5038627 (SCHWAIGER DENNIS D [US], et al) [X] 11-13,22-24 * column A *; | [X]GB1556871 (MARTIN TRANSMISSION DEVELOPMEN) [X] 14 * page 1, line 55 - page 82 *; | [XA]US4507736 (KLATT ALFRED [DE]) [X] 14 * column A; figure 1 * [A] 15-19 |