blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0571973

EP0571973 - Slow-release sodium valproate tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKKEN CHEMICALS CO., LTD.
4-14, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1993/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Ukigaya, Tadashi
1936-50, Kinome
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Endoh, Hirotaka
1-12-7-103, Arajukucho
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP
[1993/48]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/48]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date93108492.526.05.1993
[1993/48]
Priority number, dateJP1992016178529.05.1992         Original published format: JP 16178592
[1993/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0571973
Date:01.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0571973
Date:08.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0571973
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.1994
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/20, A61K9/20, A61K9/28
[1994/23]
CPC:
A61K9/2866 (EP,US); A61K31/19 (EP,US); A61K9/2813 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1993/48]A61K31/20, A61K9/20
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT [1993/48]
TitleGerman:Tablette zur langsamen Freisetzung von Natriumvalproat[1993/48]
English:Slow-release sodium valproate tablets[1993/48]
French:Comprimé au valproate de sodium à libération lente[1993/48]
Examination procedure20.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
19.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.1999Fee for grant paid
16.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6284020  ;
 [AD]EP0106443  (BENZON AS ALFRED [DK]) [AD] 1-9 * page 23; example 1 *;
 [AD]EP0133110  (SANOFI SA [FR]) [AD] 1-8* & US-A-5017613 ( AUBERT D. ET AL); page 7, line 21 - page 9, line 25 *;
 [AD]EP0342522  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * claims 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0385846  (SANOFI SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 21, Database accession no. 87-146820, & JPS6284020 A 19870417 (NIKKEN CHEM KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.