Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0571976
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.05.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] |
21.08.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] |
29.08.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] |
16.07.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.04.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.03.1995 |
First examination report |
|
17.11.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] |
15.10.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] |
15.10.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] |