EP0571976 - Static RAM with thin film transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/48] | Thin film transistor and static RAM with thin film transistor | ||
[1997/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Kunihiro 26, Kanoedai, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108495.8 | 26.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | JP19920139312 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: JP 13931292 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0571976 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0571976 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571976 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/11, H01L29/772 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H01L29/78648 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78645 (KR);
H01L29/78624 (EP,KR,US);
H10B10/125 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S257/903 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/48] | H01L29/784, H01L27/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/48] | Title | German: | Statisches RAM mit einem Dünnschichttransistor | [1997/42] | English: | Static RAM with thin film transistor | [1997/42] | French: | RAM statique comprenant un transistor à couche mince | [1997/42] |
Former [1993/48] | Dünnschichttransistor und statisches RAM mit einem Dünnschichttransistor | ||
Former [1993/48] | Thin film transistor and static RAM with thin film transistor | ||
Former [1993/48] | Transistor à couche mince et RAM statique comprenant un transistor à couche mince | Examination procedure | 26.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.05.1998 | [1999/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [PXX]JPH04125970 ; | [X]EP0382165 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0403279 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0443549 (SONY CORP [JP]) |