EP0572915 - Water dispersible polyamine-epoxy adduct and epoxy coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1993/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darwen, Stuart Paul 6, Shuttleworth Close Walley Range, Manchester M16 8NN / GB | 02 /
Cornforth, David Arthur 19 Hibson Avenue Rochdale, Lancashire OL12-7RU / GB | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108533.6 | 26.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920893151 | 03.06.1992 Original published format: US 893151 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572915 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572915 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/18, C09D163/00 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C08G59/184 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/223 (KR);
C08G59/50 (KR);
C09D163/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Wasserdispergierbares Polyamin-Epoxydharz Addukt und Epoxyüberzugsmittel | [1993/49] | English: | Water dispersible polyamine-epoxy adduct and epoxy coating composition | [1993/49] | French: | Produit d'addition d'une polyamine et d'un composé époxyde dispersible dans l'eau et composition de revêtement à base d'une résine époxyde | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.07.1997 | LI | 23.07.1997 | NL | 23.07.1997 | SE | 23.10.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/43] | CH | 23.07.1997 | |
LI | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 23.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52024300 ; | [A]EP0355654 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]); | [A]US3673558 (TOEPEL ROSEMARIE, et al); | [A]FR2290466 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE3934428 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 24, 13 June 1977, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 172532s, 'Hardeners for epoxy resins' page 50 ; & JP-A-52 024 300 (ASAHI), & JP52024300 A 19770613 |