EP0576844 - Redispersible polymer powders using polyvinyl pyrrolidone as a dispersing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1994/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bright, Randall Paul 1100 Pat Court Allentown, PA 18103 / US | 02 /
Vassallo, Jayson Charles 619 East 12th Street Northampton, PA 18067 / US | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108796.9 | 01.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | US19920894410 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: US 894410 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576844 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/16, B01F17/00 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
C08J3/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, NL [1994/01] | Title | German: | Redispergierbare Polymerpulver mit Polyvinylpyrrolidon als Dispergiermittel | [1994/01] | English: | Redispersible polymer powders using polyvinyl pyrrolidone as a dispersing aid | [1994/01] | French: | Poudres de polymères redispersables en utilisantd du polyvinylpyrrolidione commeadjuvant de dispersion | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/52] | 08.08.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61014201 ; | [A]FR1264953 (BASF AG); | [X]AU407324B ; | [A]EP0077561 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 86-064272[10] & JP-A-61 014 201 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK.) 22 January 1986, & JP61014201 A 19860122 |