EP0573010 - Apparatus for controlling automatic transmission for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamatani, Tadashi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, No.4-1, 1-chome Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Arai, Takashi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, No.4-1, 1-chome Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanizawa, Shoichi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, No.4-1, 1-chome Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Weickmann und Partner, Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/49] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108870.2 | 02.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | JP19920144423 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14442392 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573010 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573010 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/08 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
F16H2059/6807 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0448 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0488 (EP,US);
F16H2312/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/08 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1926 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/49] | Title | German: | Steuerungseinrichtung für ein automatisches Kraftfahrzeuggetriebe | [1993/49] | English: | Apparatus for controlling automatic transmission for vehicle | [1993/49] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour une transmission automatique de véhicule | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61065951 ; | [Y]JP63303251 ; | [A]JP59175658 ; | [A]JP02038750 ; | [A]JP02120557 ; | [A]EP0175212 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]DE4020340 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [AP]WO9221898 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 234 (M-507)14 August 1986 & JP-A-61 065 951 ( MAZDA ), & JP61065951 A 19860814 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 140 (M-810)6 April 1989 & JP-A-63 303 251 ( TOYOTA ), & JP63303251 A 19890406 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 029 (M-356)7 February 1985 & JP-A-59 175 658 ( TOYOTA ), & JP59175658 A 19850207 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 198 (M-965)23 April 1990 & JP-A-02 038 750 ( NISSAN ), & JP02038750 A 19900423 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 347 (M-1002)26 July 1990 & JP-A-02 120 557 ( AISIN SEIKI ), & JP02120557 A 19900726 | Examination | US3738199 | EP0209263 |