EP0589147 - Cathode ray tube and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takizawa, Tomoki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Kyoto Seisakusho, 1 Babazusho Nagaokakyo-Shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Hiroshi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Kyoto Seisakusho, 1 Babazusho Nagaokakyo-Shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108938.7 | 03.06.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | JP19920144089 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14408992 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589147 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589147 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/89, H01J29/86 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
H01J29/868 (EP,US);
H01J29/88 (KR);
H01J29/896 (EP,US);
H01J9/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre und Herstellungsverfahren | [1994/13] | English: | Cathode ray tube and method of producing the same | [1994/13] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques et méthode de fabrication | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 27.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02280101 ; | [X]DE4135448 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4747674 (BUTTERFIELD WILLIAM F [US], et al); | [A]EP0145201 (OPTICAL COATING LABORATORY INC [US]) | [X] - SID 89 DIGEST vol. XX, 16 May 1989, BALTIMORE, MARYLAND pages 270 - 273 H. KAWAMURA ET AL. 'Combined antistatic and antireflection coating for CRTs' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 44 (P-1161)4 February 1991 & JP-A-02 280 101 ( ASAHI GLASS ) 16 November 1990, & JP02280101 A 19901116 |