EP0573047 - Modular power distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHC/SPACEMASTER CORPORATION 11460 East 650 South Hudson Indiana 46747 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states RHC/SPACEMASTER CORPORATION 11460 East 650 South Hudson, Indiana 46747 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrence J. Williamson, Jr. 11460 E. 650 South, Hudson Indiana 46747 / US | 02 /
Donald C. Smith 142 Island Drive Hendersonville, TN 37075 / US | 03 /
Charles R. Snyder 151 Marcin Lane Cottontown, TN 37048 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108958.5 | 03.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920894065 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: US 894065 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573047 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/28 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
H02G3/288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Modulare Energieverteilungsvorrichtung | [1993/49] | English: | Modular power distribution system | [1993/49] | French: | Système modulaire de distribution d'énergie | [1993/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/20] | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4377724 (WILSON HAROLD R); | [A]EP0174733 (HAWORTH INC [US]); | [A]EP0413242 (AMP INC [US]) |