EP0573907 - Extruder with wall thickness measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONPRO GmbH Valdorfer Strasse 100 D-32602 Vlotho / DE | [1993/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Ulrich Dampfmühlenweg 6 W-4970 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108982.5 | 04.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | DE19924218910 | 10.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4218910 | DE19924236360 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4236360 | DE19934304687 | 16.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4304687 | [1993/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573907 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573907 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0573907 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/92, B29C47/90 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
B29C48/903 (EP);
B29C48/09 (EP);
B29C48/12 (EP);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C2948/92152 (EP);
B29C2948/92295 (EP);
B29C2948/92428 (EP);
B29C48/905 (EP);
B29C48/908 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | Extruder mit Wanddickenmessvorrichtung | [1993/50] | English: | Extruder with wall thickness measuring device | [1993/50] | French: | Extrudeuse avec dispositif de mesure de l'épaississant | [1993/50] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE Friedrich Theyson GmbH Borweg 27 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE Opponent's representative Knauf, Rudolf COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [1998/26] | 12.06.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.10.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.04.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.08.1997 | ES | 06.08.1997 | SE | 06.11.1997 | BE | 30.06.1998 | CH | 30.06.1998 | LI | 30.06.1998 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/27] | DK | 06.08.1997 | |
SE | 06.11.1997 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
CH | 30.06.1998 | ||
LI | 30.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | DK | 06.08.1997 | |
SE | 06.11.1997 | ||
CH | 30.06.1998 | ||
LI | 30.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 06.08.1997 | |
SE | 06.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 06.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1148736 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG); | [A]DE1928012 (ICI LTD); | [X]US4710146 (RASMUSSEN RUSSELL G [US], et al); | [A]EP0385285 (INOEX GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO9010530 (UPONOR NV [NL]); | [AD]EP0425944 (INOEX GMBH [DE]) |