EP0573910 - Use of a catalyst for selectively hydrogenating halonitroaromatics into aromatic haloamines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/50] | Catalyst for selectively hydrogenating halonitro aromatics into aramatic haloamines and preparation process thereof | ||
[1998/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deller, Klaus, Dr. Friedhofstrasse 47 D-6452 Hainburg / DE | 02 /
Despeyroux, Bertrand, Dr. Kleinfeller Strasse 3 D-6450 Hanau 1 / DE | 03 /
Peldszus, Erik Heegstrasse 12 D-6467 Hasselroth 1 / DE | 04 /
Kleinwächter, Beate, Dr. Gründaustrasse 5 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | [1993/50] | Application number, filing date | 93108993.2 | 04.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | DE19924218866 | 09.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4218866 | [1993/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573910 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573910 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/36, B01J23/89 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
B01J23/8926 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (KR);
C07C209/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Katalysator für die selektive Hydrierung von Halogennitroaromaten zu aromatischen Halogenaminen | [1998/04] | English: | Use of a catalyst for selectively hydrogenating halonitroaromatics into aromatic haloamines | [1998/04] | French: | Utilisation d'un catalyseur d'hydrogénation sélectives des composés aromatiques nitrés et halogénées en amines halogénées aromatique | [1998/04] |
Former [1993/50] | Katalysator für die selektive Hydrierung von Halogennitroaromaten zu aromatischen Halogenaminen und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1993/50] | Catalyst for selectively hydrogenating halonitro aromatics into aramatic haloamines and preparation process thereof | ||
Former [1993/50] | Catalyseur d'hydrogénation sélectives des composés aromatiques nitrés et halogénées en amines halogénées aromatique et procédé pour le préparer | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3546297 (KOSAK JOHN RICHARD); | [A]US3928451 (KRISHNAN RAM MURTHY); | [Y]GB2052294 (MAGYAR TUDOMANYOS AKADEMIA); | [X]EP0027979 (BASF AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0496446 (SOLVAY [BE]) |