EP0573060 - Expired air examination device and method for clinical purpose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ueda, Hideo 6-11-404, Sembanishi 2-chome Minoh-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states Ueda, Hideo 6-11-404, Sembanishi 2-chome Minoh-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Hideo 6-11-404, Sembanishi 2-chome Minoh-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Hiromoto, Mitsuo 8-2, Kihatahatayamada Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/49] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109012.0 | 03.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | JP19920170287 | 03.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17028792 | JP19920197699 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: JP 19769992 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573060 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573060 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573060 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/497, G01N27/66, G01N27/62, A61B5/083, G01N33/00 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/0836 (EP,US);
G01N33/497 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/49] | G01N33/497, G01N27/66, G01N27/62 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Untersuchung ausgeatmeter Luft für klinische Zwecke | [1993/49] | English: | Expired air examination device and method for clinical purpose | [1993/49] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour examiner de l'air expicée à des fins cliniques | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.02.2000 | FR | 09.02.2000 | IT | 09.02.2000 | LI | 09.02.2000 | GB | 03.06.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/32] | CH | 09.02.2000 | |
FR | 09.02.2000 | ||
LI | 09.02.2000 | ||
GB | 03.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | CH | 09.02.2000 | |
LI | 09.02.2000 | ||
GB | 03.06.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 09.02.2000 | |
LI | 09.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 15.05.2000 | |
LI | 15.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4413185 (LEVESON RICHARD C [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 11; figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 31 - line 44 *; | [A]US4114422 (HUTSON DONALD G) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US4735777 (MITSUI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6 * column W *; | [A]US4994096 (KLEIN KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US4772559 (PRETI GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]US3883739 (JENKINS ANTHONY) [A] 1-6 * column W * |