EP0574777 - Method and means for assembling stacks of sheets with binding elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOMAKO Maschinenkonstruktionen GmbH Postfach 20 80 D-72610 Nürtingen / DE | [1993/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufmann, Rudolf Schulweg 24 W-7442 Neuffen / DE | 02 /
Scholz, Jürgen Neckarstrasse 17A W-7446 Oberboihingen / DE | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Hiss, Ludwig, et al c/o Körber AG, Patentabteilung 21027 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Hiss, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Körber AG, Patentabteilung D-21027 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109015.3 | 04.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | DE19924219792 | 17.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4219792 | [1993/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574777 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574777 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B42B5/08 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
B42B5/08 (EP,US);
Y10S402/501 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zusammenfügen von Papierlagen und Bindungskörpern | [1993/51] | English: | Method and means for assembling stacks of sheets with binding elements | [1993/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour assembler des liasses de feuilles avec des éléments de reliure | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.05.1997 | IT | 02.05.1997 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR994423 (S T D) |