EP0583567 - Workshop mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hegner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Herzogstrasse 25 D-85465 Langenpreising / DE | [1994/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Wey, Hans-Heinrich Hans Cornelius Strasse 3 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Wey, Hans-Heinrich Hans Cornelius Strasse 3 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109383.5 | 11.06.1993 | [1994/08] | Priority number, date | DE19920010669U | 10.08.1992 Original published format: DE 9210669 U | [1994/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0583567 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0583567 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, G02B7/182, A47G1/02 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
A47G1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/08] | G02B5/08, G02B7/182 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | Atelierspiegel | [1994/08] | English: | Workshop mirror | [1994/08] | French: | Miroir d'atelier | [1994/08] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/32] | 10.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | 30.08.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.1995 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1222090 (HARRIS AND SHELDON (DISPLAY) LIMITED) [X] 1,2,6,8,25-28 * page 1, line 63 - line 82; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2163855 (JULES BAVOUX S.A.) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 1; figures 1-3 * |