EP0578011 - Multi-electrode plasma processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moslehi, Mehrdad M. 15350-B Segouia Drive Dallas, TXC 75248 / US | 02 /
Jones, John 7700 Jerome Drive Plano, TX 70525 / US | 03 /
Davis, Cecil J. Route 4, Box 113C Greenville, TX 75401 / US | 04 /
Matthews, Robert t. 2417 Parkhaven Drive Plano, Texas 75075 / US | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109535.0 | 15.06.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | US19920903637 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: US 903637 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578011 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578011 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
H01J37/32862 (EP,US);
C23C16/4405 (EP,US);
C23C16/509 (EP,US);
C23C16/517 (EP,US);
H01J37/32165 (EP,US);
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
H01J37/32541 (EP,US);
H01J37/32587 (EP,US);
H01J37/32688 (EP,US);
Y10S438/905 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/02] | Title | German: | Mehrelektrischen Plasma Behandlungsgerät | [1994/02] | English: | Multi-electrode plasma processing apparatus | [1994/02] | French: | Appareil le traitement par plasma multi-électrodes | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.03.1997 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4464223 (GORIN GEORGES J [US]); | [Y]US4960488 (LAW KAM S [US], et al); | [A]US5006192 (DEGUCHI MIKIO [JP]); | [A]US5084125 (AOI NOBUO [JP]) |