EP0561431 - Two-stage joule-thomson cryostat with gas supply management system, and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skertic, Matthew M. 9736 Oakdale Avenue Chatsworth, California 91311 / US | 02 /
Hlava, Joseph L. 20601 Tiara Street Woodland Hills, California 91367 / US | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1993/38] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109561.6 | 01.03.1991 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | US19900497379 | 22.03.1990 Original published format: US 497379 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0561431 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0561431 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/02, F25B9/10 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
F25B9/02 (EP,US);
F42B15/34 (KR);
F25B9/10 (EP,US);
F25B2309/023 (EP,US);
F25D2400/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/38] | Title | German: | Zweistufiger Joule-Thomson-Kryostat mit Gaszufuhrsteuerungssystem und dessen Verwendungen | [1993/38] | English: | Two-stage joule-thomson cryostat with gas supply management system, and uses thereof | [1993/38] | French: | Cryostat Joule-Thomson à deux étages avec un système de gestion de l'alimentation en gaz et ses utilisations | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91103126.8 / EP0447861 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2909908 (ALEXIS PASTUHOV, et al); | [A]US2991633 (SIMON FRANK N); | [XA]US3095711 (WURTZ JR HOWARD P) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 6; figure 2 * [A] 3-5,7; | [YA]FR1468862 (AIR LIQUIDE) [Y] 9 * page 1, column R, paragraph 9 - page 3, column L, paragraph 8; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-4; | [Y]US3372556 (MARVIN WALDMAN) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [DYA]US3401533 (BRADLEY MAYBURY ALAN) [DY] 3-5 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 38; figure . * [A] 1,2; | [A]US3413819 (SIEGFRIED HANSEN); | [XY]US3422632 (CURRIE ROBERT B, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 25 - column 10, line 39; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5,9,10; | [DA]GB1238911 (THE HYMATIC ENGINEERING) [DA] 1,3 * page 2, line 72 - page 3, line 128; figure . *; | [A]US4126017 (BYTNIEWSKI JOSEPH, et al) | by applicant | US3401533 | GB1238911 |