EP0574901 - Image signal processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | |||
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Masahiro, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Iga, Hiroyuki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Hoshino, Kiyoshi, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Akamatsu, Naoki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 05 /
Tokoro, Kenichi, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 06 /
Shimazaki, Hisao, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109643.2 | 16.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | JP19920156984 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698492 | JP19920156985 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698592 | JP19920156986 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698692 | JP19920156987 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698792 | JP19920156988 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698892 | JP19920156989 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698992 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0574901 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0574901 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/46 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
H04N5/46 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/42607 (EP,US);
H04N21/42638 (EP,US);
H04N21/4435 (EP,US);
H04N5/211 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1993/51] | Title | German: | Bildsignalverarbeitungsgerät | [1993/51] | English: | Image signal processor | [1993/51] | French: | Processeur de signaux d'image | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/41] | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0449075 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,11-13 * abstract * * column 6, line 14 - column 8, line 54 *; | [A]JPH04134976 ; | [PA]EP0529442 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920826), vol. 16, no. 403, Database accession no. (E - 1254), & JP04134976 A 19920508 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,11-13 * abstract * | [A] - VLAJNIC ET AL., "Universal DSP Board", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING, AMSTERDAM NL, (198901), vol. 25, no. 1-5, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-6074(89)90171-3, XP026654949 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(89)90171-3 | [A] - MURAKAMI ET AL., "A Proposed Universal Signal-Processing System", SMPTE JOURNAL, SCARSDALE, NY US, (198706), vol. 96, no. 6, pages 527 - 531, XP002043190 [A] 1 * figure 1; table 1 * | [PA] - PIRES ET AL., "Digital Broadcasting TV Decoding in the Presence of Errors : preliminary simulation study", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1993 PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM; 17-19 MARCH 1993;, LAUSANNE, CH [PA] 1 * pages 17.3/a-b * * page 17.3/b, line 17 - line 23 *;; figure 1 * |