EP0581009 - Thermoplastic polymer composition with polymeric processing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [1999/29] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Agomer Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schüll, Volker, Dr. Prischossstrasse 26 W-8755 Alzenau/Ufr. / DE | 02 /
Arnoldi, Detlef Dr. Südtiroler Ring 37 W-6719 Weisenheim am Berg / DE | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Reinhard Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patente - Marken Standort Wolfgang Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 Postfach 13 45 63403 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Herrmann, Reinhard Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patente - Marken Standort Wolfgang Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 Postfach 13 45 63403 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | ||
Former [1997/46] | Weber, Wolfgang, et al Degussa AG Fachbereich Patente Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109715.8 | 17.06.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | DE19924220453 | 23.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4220453 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0581009 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0581009 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581009 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C08L101/00, // (C08L101/00, 57:06) | [1994/05] | CPC: |
C08L33/06 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L57/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L33/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT [1994/05] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Polymerzusammensetzung mit polymerem Verarbeitungshilfsmittel | [1994/05] | English: | Thermoplastic polymer composition with polymeric processing agent | [1994/05] | French: | Composition de polymères thermoplastiques contenant un agent polymérique facilitant la mise en forme | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 15.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2077462 ; | [X]JP59122509 ; | [X]US2737502 (LAND JR WILLIAM M, et al); | [XD]US2868763 (MONTGOMERY CHARLES W); | [X]GB971673 (ICI LTD); | [X]FR2125989 (BASF AG); | [X]US3705137 (KUWAHARA KENSHI, et al); | [X]EP0058229 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114 Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 44243h, HOSAKA ET AL 'vinyl chloride polymer compositions containing heat stabilizers with excellent fluidity and plasticizer absorption' & JP-A-2 077 462 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) 16. März 1990, & JP2077462 A 00000000 | [X] - POLYMER JOURNAL Bd. 20, Nr. 8, 1988, TOKYO JP Seiten 693 - 698 HIRABAYASHI, KIKUTA, KASABOU, YOKOTA 'Main-chain Flexibility and Side-chain Crystallization of widely spaced Comb-like Polymers' | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 241 (C-250)(1678) & JP-A-59 122 509 ( MITSUBISHI RAYON KK ) 16. July 1984, & JP59122509 A 00000000 | [Y] - GÄCHTER, MÜLLER 'Handbuch der Kunststoff-Additive' 1979 , HANSER , MÜNCHEN DE Kapitel 7; K.-D. Böhme, "Hochpolymere PVC-Verarbeitungshilfsmittel" | Examination | JPS55164209 |