EP0574941 - Alcohol acetyltransferase genes and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Toshio c/o Kirin Beer K.K., 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Iwamatsu, Akihiro c/o Kirin Beer K.K., 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Yoshimoto, Hiroyuki c/o Kirin Beer K.K., 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 04 /
Minetoki, Toshitaka c/o Ozeki K.K., 4-9, Imazu Dezaike-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Bogaki, Takayuki c/o Ozeki K.K., 4-9, Imazu Dezaike-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Nagasawa, Naoshi c/o Ozeki K.K., 4-9, Imazu Dezaike-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Kolb, Helga, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109775.2 | 18.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | JP19920184328 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: JP 18432892 | JP19930062997 | 26.02.1993 Original published format: JP 6299793 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0574941 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0574941 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574941 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N15/54, C12Q1/68, C12N15/81, C12G3/00, C12N9/24 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
C12C5/004 (EP,US);
C12C11/00 (EP,US);
C12C11/003 (EP,US);
C12C11/02 (EP,US);
C12C12/004 (EP,US);
C12C12/006 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/51] | C12N9/10, C12N15/54, C12Q1/68, C12N15/81, C12G3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/51] | Title | German: | Alkohol-Acetyltransferase und deren Anwendung | [1993/51] | English: | Alcohol acetyltransferase genes and use thereof | [1993/51] | French: | Acétyltransférase d'alcool et son usage | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2001 | CH | 16.05.2001 | GR | 16.05.2001 | IT | 16.05.2001 | LI | 16.05.2001 | IE | 18.06.2001 | LU | 18.06.2001 | MC | 16.07.2001 | PT | 16.08.2001 | SE | 16.08.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
GR | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
LU | 18.06.2001 | ||
MC | 16.07.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2006/39] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
GR | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
MC | 16.07.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
GR | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
LU | 16.07.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
LU | 16.07.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 16.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02035080 ; | [Y]WO9106636 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) | [XD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 011 Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 93765t, AKITA, OSAMU; SUZUKI, SYUZI; OBATA, TAKAJI; HARA, SHODO 'Purification and some properties of alcohol acetyltransferase from sake yeast' | [X] - BIOSIS PREVIEWS DATABASE,Philadelphia,US Ab.No.95066783 MALCORPS P; DUFOUR J-P 'SHORT-CHAIN AND...' | [A] - BIOSIS PREVIEWS DATABASE,Philadelphia,US Ab.No.88025463 YANAGIUCHI T; KIYOKAWA Y; WAKAI Y 'ISOLATION OF SAKE-YEAST...' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 192 (C-0711)19 April 1990 & JP-A-02 035 080 ( TAX ADM AGENCY,ET AL. ) 5 February 1990, & JP02035080 A 19900205 |