EP0575923 - Triazole Derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ikeda Mohando Co., Ltd. No. 24, Yokohouonji Kamiichi-cho Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states Ikeda Mohando Co., Ltd. No. 24, Yokohouonji Kamiichi-cho Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Kazu No. 178, Takariya-Shin-machi Toyama-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109829.7 | 19.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920165777 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16577792 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575923 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, C07D207/32, A61K31/41 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
C07D207/323 (EP);
C07D403/12 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
C07D207/33 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Triazolderivate | [1993/52] | English: | Triazole Derivatives | [1993/52] | French: | Dérivés de triazole | [1993/52] | File destroyed: | 29.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0174769 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [AD]EP0122693 (ICI PLC [GB]) |