EP0575928 - Railroad freight car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Technology) GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | [1998/19] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states ABB HENSCHEL WAGGON UNION GmbH Miraustrasse 30 D-13509 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bieker, Guido Ennestweg 7 D-57399 Kirchhundem / DE | 02 /
Köhler, Günter, Dr. Aehlstrasse 22 D-57074 Siegen / DE | 03 /
Schöler, Klaus Schulstrasse 10 D-57080 Siegen / DE | 04 /
Wagener, Paul-Werner An der Netphe 39 D-57250 Netphen / DE | [1998/12] |
Former [1993/52] | 01 /
Bieker, Guido Ennestweg 7 D-5942 Kirchhundem / DE | ||
02 /
Köhler, Günter, Dr. Aehlstrasse 22 D-5900 Siegen / DE | |||
03 /
Schöler, Klaus Schulstrasse 10 D-5900 Siegen / DE | |||
04 /
Wagener, Paul-Werner An der Netphe 39 D-5902 Netphen 1 / DE | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109849.5 | 21.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | DE19924220930 | 26.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4220930 | [1993/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575928 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575928 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B61D39/00 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
B61D39/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Eisenbahngüterwagen | [1993/52] | English: | Railroad freight car | [1993/52] | French: | Wagon de marchandises | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.03.1998 | GB | 18.03.1998 | IT | 18.03.1998 | NL | 18.03.1998 | SE | 18.06.1998 | AT | 21.06.1998 | CH | 30.06.1998 | LI | 30.06.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
NL | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
AT | 21.06.1998 | ||
CH | 30.06.1998 | ||
LI | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
AT | 21.06.1998 | ||
CH | 30.06.1998 | ||
LI | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
CH | 30.06.1998 | ||
LI | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
CH | 30.06.1998 | ||
LI | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | SE | 18.06.1998 | |
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | SE | 18.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3312001 (WAGGON UNION GMBH [DE]) | [X] - ZEV-GLASERS ANNALEN Bd. 111, Nr. 10, Oktober 1987, ,BERLIN W. GERMANY Seiten 333 - 334 H]BSCH 'tragende leichmetall-bauelemente am beispiel der schiebewandentwicklung für güterwagen' |