EP0578057 - Aggregate treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunning, Robert Lewis W.3815 Indian Trail Road Spokane, Washington 99208 / US | 02 /
Schulz, Gerald Owen 3762 Leewood Drive Stow, Ohio 44224 / US | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1994/40] |
Former [1994/02] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 93110058.0 | 24.06.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | US19920909514 | 06.07.1992 Original published format: US 909514 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0578057 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0578057 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578057 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/08, C04B20/10 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C04B20/1029 (EP,US);
C04B26/26 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0075 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/26, C04B20/1029 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/74 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | Zuschlagstoffbehandlung | [1994/02] | English: | Aggregate treatment | [1994/02] | French: | Traitement d'agrégat | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 30.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2454803 (ZANEN HOLLAND WEGENBOUW [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-15 * * example 1 *; | [A]US4532271 (KAI ISAO [JP], et al); | [PXA]US5219901 (BURKE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,10 * claims 1-17 * * column 4, line 28 - line 68 * * examples 1,3 * [PA] 5-9 |