EP0577009 - Shaped articles for biomedical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL | [1999/39] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 NL-2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states SPHERILENE S.p.A. Foro Buonaparte 31 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states SPHERILENE S.r.l. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galimberti, Maurizio Via Vertoiba 4 I-20137 Milano / IT | 02 /
Martini, Emilio Via Altopiano 82 I-40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | 03 /
Albizzati, Enrico Via Roma 64 I-28041 Arona (NO) / IT | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Zanoli, Enrico Spherilene S.p.A. Via Taramelli 26/28 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93110096.0 | 24.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI01593 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: IT MI921593 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577009 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577009 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/00, A61L31/00, A61L27/00 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
A61L31/048 (EP);
A61L27/16 (EP);
A61L29/041 (EP);
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP);
C08L2314/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L23/08 (EP);
A61L27/16, C08L23/16 (EP);
A61L27/16, C08L23/16, C08L23/08 (EP);
A61L29/041, C08L23/08 (EP);
A61L29/041, C08L23/16 (EP);
A61L29/041, C08L23/16, C08L23/08 (EP);
A61L31/048, A61J3/00, A61J1/00, C08L23/16, C08L23/08 (EP);
A61L31/048, C08L23/08 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/20] |
Former [1994/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Formkörper zur biomedizinische Verwendung | [1994/01] | English: | Shaped articles for biomedical use | [1994/01] | French: | Articles façonnés à usage biomédical | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2053246 (NAPHTACHIMIE SA); | [A]FR2537981 (EL PASO POLYOLEFINS [US]) |