EP0577099 - Cooling apparatus for electronic elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwahara, Heikichi 33-11, Komatsu-1-chome Tsuchiura-shi / JP | 02 /
Fujioka, Kazumasa 1-25-2, Inayoshiminami, Chiyodamachi Niiharu-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Takasaki, Toshio 10-1, Aobacho Katsuta-shi / JP | 04 /
Saitoo, Syuuji 2153-43, Tsuda Katsuta-shi / JP | 05 /
Toyota, Eiichi 1432-5, Ikazuchi Tabiko, Katsuta-shi / JP | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/01] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110438.4 | 30.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | JP19920176497 | 03.07.1992 Original published format: JP 17649792 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0577099 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0577099 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577099 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/367, H01L23/40, H01L23/427 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
H01L23/34 (KR);
F28D15/0275 (EP,US);
H01L25/072 (EP,US);
H05K7/20936 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/01] | H01L23/367, H01L23/40 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1994/01] | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung für elektronische Elemente | [1994/01] | English: | Cooling apparatus for electronic elements | [1994/01] | French: | Appareil de refroidissement pour éléments électroniques | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2288395 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]DE2825582 (GEN ELECTRIC) | Examination | JP1192148 | EP0363687 | - W. Bresch, "Hybride Leistungs-IC", Technische Rundschau, 78 (1986), Nov., No. 45, Bern, Schweiz, 106-109 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13 no. 483, 2nd November 1989 (E-839); & JP-A-1 192 148, & JP1192148 A 00000000 |