EP0579048 - Batch sinterable at low temperatures for manufacture of piezoelectric, ceramic formed bodies and formed body manufactured therefrom by sintering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CeramTec AG Innovative Ceramic Engineering Fabrikstrasse 23 - 29 73207 Plochingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states CeramTec AG Innovative Ceramic Engineering Fabrikstrasse 23 - 29 73207 Plochingen / DE | ||
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states Hoechst CeramTec Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-95100 Selb / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helke, Günter, Dr. Breite Strasse 29 D-8560 Lauf / DE | 02 /
Langer, Hans-Joachim Holzstrasse 45 D-8560 Lauf / DE | 03 /
Handschuh, Kurt Am Weinberg D-8501 Eckental / DE | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Wilfried, et al Dynamit Nobel AG Abt.Patente und Dokumentation 53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Schulz, Wilfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dynamit Nobel AG Abt.Patente und Dokumentation 53839 Troisdorf / DE | ||
Former [1997/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1994/03] | Hoffmann, Peter, Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110514.2 | 01.07.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | DE19924223186 | 15.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4223186 | [1994/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0579048 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0579048 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/187 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
H10N30/853 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/03] | H01L41/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | Bei niedrigen Temperaturen sinterbarer Versatz zur Herstellung von piezoelektrischen, keramischen Formkörpern und daraus durch Sintern hergestellte Formkörper | [1994/03] | English: | Batch sinterable at low temperatures for manufacture of piezoelectric, ceramic formed bodies and formed body manufactured therefrom by sintering | [1994/03] | French: | Composition frittable à basse température pour la fabrication de formes piézoélectriques céramiques et formes fabriquées à partir de ces compositions par frittage | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/53] | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3580846 (OKUYAMA CHIYOSHI, et al) [X] 1,7,8 * example B6 *; | [X]GB2077253 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3,9 * claim - *; | [X]DE3200339 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 17 *; | [A]EP0376508 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [X] - SAVENKOVA, G. E. ET AL, "Piezoelectric ceramic based on lead zirconate titanate with superior piezoelectric properties", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19730409), vol. 78, no. 14, Database accession no. 89952, XP002021639 [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * | [DA] - R.B. ATKIN ET AL, "Substitution of Bi and Nb Ions in Lead Zirconate-Titanate", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, COLUMBUS US, (1971), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 113 - 115, XP002021638 [DA] 1 * the whole document * |