EP0577137 - A quantum effect device and a method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kenji 3-5-19, Takano-dai Suita-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Morimoto, Kiyoshi 26-13-405, Koriminamino-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Udagawa, Masaharu 2-1-3-401, Uehara Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yuki, Koichiro 22-7-421, Korinishino-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Niwa, Masaaki 9-30, Korien-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Hirai, Yoshihiko 2-1-3-807, Shigino-nishi, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Yasui, Juro 2-11-5, Higashi-izumigaoka Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110609.0 | 02.07.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | JP19920176597 | 03.07.1992 Original published format: JP 17659792 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577137 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577137 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/334 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/882 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/1037 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H01L29/66931 (EP,US);
H01L29/772 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/01] | Title | German: | Quanteneffektbauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [1994/01] | English: | A quantum effect device and a method of producing the same | [1994/01] | French: | Dispositif à effet quantique et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1994/01] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/37: Teilanmeldung 95119854.8 eingereicht am 15/12/95 | EPB 1996/37: Divisional application 95119854.8 filed on 15/12/95 | EPB 1996/37: Demande divisionnaire 95119854.8 déposée le 15/12/95 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95119854.8 / EP0709895 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4989052 (OKADA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [X]EP0464834 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) | [A] - GALLIUM ARESENIDE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS 1990 24 September 1990, JERSEY pages 293 - 298 M.A. FOAD ET AL. |