EP0582831 - Procedure and device for making measurements on optical waveguides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kossat, Rainer Hainbach 34 D-83229 Aschau / DE | 02 /
Loch, Manfred, Dr. Knotestrasse 16 D-81479 München / DE | 03 /
Lieber, Winfried, Dr. Königenberg 24 D-77654 Offenburg / DE | 04 /
Ruegenberg, Gervin Krüner Strasse 100b D-81377 München / DE | [1994/07] | Application number, filing date | 93110781.7 | 06.07.1993 | [1994/07] | Priority number, date | DE19924225239 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4225239 | [1994/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582831 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582831 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
G01M11/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/07] | Title | German: | Einrichtung für Messungen an Lichtwellenleitern und Verfahren zur Durchführung der Messung | [1994/07] | English: | Procedure and device for making measurements on optical waveguides | [1994/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour faire des mesures avec des guides d'ondes lumineuses | [1994/07] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4534615 (IWASAKI KENJI [JP]) [Y] 6,10,12-14,16 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,3 ** column 4, line 58 - line 63 *; | [XY]EP0421657 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-3,7,22,26,29,32-35 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-3; claims 9-16 * [Y] 4,6,9,10,12-14,16,25,30,36; | [YA]EP0485629 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,9,25,30,36 * the whole document * [A] 17-19 | Examination | DE3429947 | WO9316363 |