EP0589158 - Remote controlled lock, particularly for motor vehicle doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Peter Breitensteinstrasse 1 D-83052 Götting / DE | 02 /
Seeser, Günter, Dr. Strassbergerstrasse 47-14 D-80809 München / DE | 03 /
Wegge, Martin Schafhäutlstrasse 1a D-80937 München / DE | 04 /
Schüch, Siegmund Kagerstrasse 4a D-81669 München / DE | 05 /
Schackmann, Horst Ingelsberger Weg 9 D-85604 Zorneding / DE | 06 /
Weishaupt, Walter Im Wismat 28 D-81247 München / DE | 07 /
Eckrich, Michael Amalienstrasse 43 D-80799 München / DE | 08 /
Wimmer, Manfred Kastanienweg D-86343 Königsbrunn / DE | 09 /
Bauer, Franz Gärtnerstrasse 36 D-82194 Gröbenzell / DE | 10 /
Linde, Hansjürgen, Prof. Dr. Heckenweg 47 D-96450 Coburg / DE | 11 /
Fritsch, Martin Coburger Strasse 14 D-96479 Weidach / DE | 12 /
Hübner, Horst Cottenbach 24 D-95500 Heinersreuth / DE | 13 /
Menzel, Stephan Hans-Suess-Strasse 15 D-95326 Kulmbach / DE | 14 /
Büchner, Oliver Sudetenstrasse 4 D-96465 Neustadt b. Coburg / DE | 15 /
Pemsel, Rolf Wachholderweg 12 D-72202 Nagold / DE | 16 /
Schneider, Udo Rossrieth 25 D-97638 Mellrichstadt / DE | 17 /
Hohmann, Christian Kronacher Strasse 26 D-96215 Lichtenfels / DE | 18 /
Ritter, Andreas Alte Siedlung 11 D-96328 Küps / DE | 19 /
Herbst, Frank Kastanienweg 8 D-96260 Weismain / DE | 20 /
Nemmert, Peter Bahnhofstrasse 17 D-96450 Coburg / DE | 21 /
Stegner, Achim Nussleite 16 D-96472 Rödental / DE | [1994/13] | Application number, filing date | 93110812.0 | 07.07.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | DE19924228233 | 25.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4228233 | DE19924240013 | 27.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4240013 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589158 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589158 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, E05B65/36 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
E05B77/26 (EP);
E05B77/28 (EP);
E05B81/08 (EP);
E05B81/14 (EP);
G07C9/00182 (EP);
E05B77/12 (EP);
E05B77/30 (EP);
E05B85/01 (EP);
E05B85/243 (EP);
G07C2009/00793 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/13] | Title | German: | Fernsteuerbares Schloss, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeugtüren | [1994/13] | English: | Remote controlled lock, particularly for motor vehicle doors | [1994/13] | French: | Serrure commandable à distance, en particulier pour des portières de véhicule automobile | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1998
02.11.1998
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1998
02.11.1998
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr, Weidener, Häckel Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1998
02.11.1998
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm (DE) Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | 04.12.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.02.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.02.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.12.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.01.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/14] | Appeal following opposition | 22.12.2005 | Appeal received No. T1595/05 | 22.12.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.12.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 29.10.2002 | Appeal received No. T1081/02 | 20.12.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.01.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 24.10.2002 | Appeal received | 19.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.09.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3712552 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,8,13 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0218251 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,13 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2069587 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 63 - line 128; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2116621 (FORD MOTOR CO) [A] 1,2,21 * page 1, line 72 - page 2, line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3334049 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE]) |