EP0581079 - Particular 1,4-dihydropyridine-3,5-dicarboxylic acid ester, process for its preparation and its pharmaceutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behner, Otto, Dr. In den Birken 83 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Wollweber, Hartmund, Dr. In den Birken 73 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
Rosen, Bruno, Dr. Marienburger Strasse 65 D-42489 Wülfrath / DE | 04 /
Zaiss, Siegfried, Dr. Farnweg 3 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Goldmann, Siegfried, Dr. Am Osterholz 91 D-42327 Wuppertal / DE | [1994/05] | Application number, filing date | 93110936.7 | 08.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | DE19924223867 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4223867 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581079 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/90, A61K31/44 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
C07D211/90 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | Spezieller, 1,4-Dihydropyridin-3,5-dicarbonsäureester, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine pharmazeutische Verwendung | [1994/05] | English: | Particular 1,4-dihydropyridine-3,5-dicarboxylic acid ester, process for its preparation and its pharmaceutical use | [1994/05] | French: | Ester d'acide 1,4-dihydropyridine-3,5-dicarboxylique spécifique, procédé pour sa préparation et son utilisation pharmaceutique | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 22.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1998/25] | 29.01.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0234776 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]EP0451654 (BAYER AG [DE]) |