EP0585576 - Punching machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerdes, Heinrich Schützenweg 17 D-49733 Haren/Ems / DE | For all designated states Feldker, Alois Kirchstrasse 160 D-49779 Oberlangen / DE | [1994/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerdes, Heinrich Schützenweg 17 D-49733 Haren/Ems / DE | 02 /
Feldker, Alois Kirchstrasse 160 D-49779 Oberlangen / DE | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Wehser, Wulf, et al Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12 30161 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Wehser, Wulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12 D-30161 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1994/10] | Wehser, Wulf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wehser & Partner Roscherstrasse 12 D-30161 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111350.0 | 15.07.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | DE19924225836 | 05.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4225836 | [1994/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585576 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585576 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/26, B21D43/00 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
B21D28/34 (EP);
B21D43/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | Lochstanze | [1994/10] | English: | Punching machine | [1994/10] | French: | Machine à poinçonner | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.1993 | 24.09.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.1993 | 24.09.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.1993 | 24.09.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.1993 | 24.09.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.1993 | 24.09.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4879894 (BENEDICT ROGER J [US], et al); | [AP]DE4121981 (GERDES HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [A]DE2718536 (BLACKMAN MARTIN GROUP); | [A]EP0418779 (FEINTOOL INT HOLDING [CH]) |