EP0634106 - Process for treating water-soluble dietary fiber with beta-glucanase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Quaker Oats Company 617 West Main Street Barrington Illinois 60010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states THE QUAKER OATS COMPANY 617 West Main Street Barrington Illinois 60010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, John J. 1089 Kingsdale Road Hoffman Estates, Illinois 60194 / US | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111393.0 | 15.07.1993 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634106 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634106 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/105, A23L1/308 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
A23G3/346 (EP);
A21D2/36 (EP);
A23G9/52 (EP);
A23L27/60 (EP);
A23L33/21 (EP);
A23L7/107 (EP);
A23L7/115 (EP);
C12Y302/01001 (EP);
C12Y303/02001 (EP);
A23G2200/14 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung einer wasserlösslichen Diätfaser mit Beta-Glucanase | [1995/03] | English: | Process for treating water-soluble dietary fiber with beta-glucanase | [1995/03] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'une fibre diététique hydrosoluble avec la bêta-glucanase | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.04.1999 | GR | 14.04.1999 | LI | 14.04.1999 | PT | 14.07.1999 | ES | 19.10.1999 | [2004/04] |
Former [2001/23] | CH | 14.04.1999 | |
GR | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 14.04.1999 | |
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | PT | 14.07.1999 | |
CH | 20.07.1999 | ||
LI | 20.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | PT | 14.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0058133 (VEHNAE AB OY [FI]) [X] 1-18* claim - *; | [Y]WO8601080 (BARCO INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 10, lines 8-10; claim - *; | [X]EP0286056 (SUOMEN SOKERI OY [FI]) [X] 1-18 * example 3; claim - *; | [X]WO8908405 (MOLIN NILS [SE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 5, lines 1-10; example .; claims 1,2,6,9,10 *; | [Y]WO9100027 (INGLETT GEORGE E [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, paragraph 3; claim - *; | [D]US4996063 (INGLETT GEORGE F [US]); | [Y]WO9210106 (INGLETT GEORGE E [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, paragraph 2; claim - * | [DY] - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of chemical technology, NEW YORK.N.Y., J.WILEY & SONS, (1980) [DY] 1-18 * third edition,volume 9 * * pages 214,215; page 214, column 3, line 21 - line 26 * *page 215,"beta-glucanase","Cereflo 200"* |