EP0581134 - Safety buckle for automobile safety belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA (EUROPE) VEHICLE SAFETY TECHNOLOGY GmbH Helmholtzstrasse 22, Science Park D-89081 Ulm / DE | [1994/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitzkus, Jürgen Röntgenstrasse 3 W-7075 Mutlangen / DE | 02 /
Kopetzky, Robert Goethestrasse 18/2 W-7075 Mutlangen / DE | 03 /
Clarke, Ron 6, Demesne Avenue, Holywood County Down North Ireland BT18 9ND / GB | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111395.5 | 15.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | DE19924225404 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4225404 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0581134 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0581134 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581134 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/25 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
A44B11/2523 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurtschloss einer Sicherheitsgurtanordnung bei Kraftfahrzeugen | [1994/05] | English: | Safety buckle for automobile safety belt | [1994/05] | French: | Boucle de sécurité pour ceintures de sécurité de véhicules | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.03.1997 | FR | 12.03.1997 | GB | 12.03.1997 | IT | 12.03.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | AT | 15.07.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
AT | 15.07.1997 | ||
FR | 08.08.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 12.03.1997 | |
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
AT | 15.07.1997 | ||
FR | 08.08.1997 | ||
Former [1999/01] | GB | 12.03.1997 | |
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
AT | 15.07.1997 | ||
FR | 08.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | GB | 12.03.1997 | |
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
FR | 08.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 12.03.1997 | |
FR | 08.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | FR | 08.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8000404 (AUTOLIV AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]EP0040132 (PEUGEOT ACIERS ET OUTILLAGE [FR]) [A] 1-5* figure - *; | [AD]US4597141 (WIER FRANZ [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * figure - *; | [AD]US4926528 (MATSUKI MASUO [JP]) [AD] 1-5 * figure - * |