EP0586841 - Printed circuit board and mounting module for connection of a shielded cable and distribution system for low-voltage installation construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reichle + De-Massari AG Elektro-Ingenieure Binzstrasse 31 8620 Wetzikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states Reichle + De-Massari AG Elektro-Ingenieure Binzstrasse 31 CH-8620 Wetzikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichle, Hans Guldislooweg 16 CH-8620 Wetzikon / CH | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro Petschner & Partner Rothusmatt 5 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro G. Petschner Wannenstrasse 16 CH-8800 Thalwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 93111518.2 | 19.07.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | CH19920002406 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: CH 240692 | CH19920002407 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: CH 240792 | [1994/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586841 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00, H01R9/05 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
H05K13/00 (EP,US);
H05K9/00 (KR);
H01R9/0515 (EP,US);
H05K3/0052 (EP,US);
H01R9/0527 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0909 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09827 (EP,US);
H05K3/0061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/11] | Title | German: | Printplatte und Montagemodul für einen Anschluss abgeschirmter Leiter und Verteilersysteme im Schwachstrom-Anlagebau | [1994/11] | English: | Printed circuit board and mounting module for connection of a shielded cable and distribution system for low-voltage installation construction | [1994/11] | French: | Circuit imprimé et module de montage pour connexion d'un câble blindé et système répartiteur pour construction d'un dispositif basse-tension | [1994/11] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/11] | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02137390 ; | [X]JPH02112298 ; | [A]JPH03116890 ; | [A]DE1921192 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,3,5,7 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2633175 (STAIGER FEINMECH) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900816), vol. 014, no. 380, Database accession no. (E - 0965), & JP02137390 A 19900525 (FUJITSU) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900719), vol. 014, no. 336, Database accession no. (E - 0953), & JP02112298 A 19900424 (NEC) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910812), vol. 015, no. 315, Database accession no. (E - 1099), & JP03116890 A 19910517 (NIPPON DEMPA) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |