Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0581158
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.10.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] |
11.10.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] |
10.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.08.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] |
08.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.04.1996 |
First examination report |
|
20.03.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] |
20.12.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] |
17.12.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |