EP0580102 - Ethylene copolymerization process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDaniel, Max Paul 1601 Melmart Drive Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 02 /
Benham, Elizabeth Ann 431 Shannon Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111543.0 | 19.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | US19920915562 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: US 915562 | [1994/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0580102 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0580102 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/655 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08F210/02 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/6492 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6557 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1994/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ethylencopolymerisation | [1994/04] | English: | Ethylene copolymerization process | [1994/04] | French: | Procédé de copolymérisation d'éthylène | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/03] | 11.12.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 09.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0324588 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 12* example - *; | [DX]EP0480375 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [DX] 1-12 * claims 1-14,16 * |