EP0580105 - Vehicle-guiding device for recognizing curved road and leading vehicle along curved road aurally [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | |||
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | ||
For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishi, Hiroshi 8-89-302, Yamanote Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Toru 801 Yagoto Fujimi, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466 / JP | 03 /
Morimoto, Kyomi 288-1, Nagayoshi-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi 445 / JP | 04 /
Yokoyama, Shoji Anjo-Gurando-Haitsu(312), 3-18, Sakura-machi Anjo-shi, Aichi 446 / JP | 05 /
Kuroda, Kenji 6-9, Geshi-cho Sabae-shi, Fukui 916 / JP | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/04] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111551.3 | 19.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | JP19920192528 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: JP 19252892 | JP19920193572 | 21.07.1992 Original published format: JP 19357292 | [1994/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580105 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580105 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0968 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
G01C21/3629 (EP,US);
G08G1/096861 (EP,US);
G08G1/096872 (EP,US);
G08G1/0968 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/04] | Title | German: | Navigationsgerät für Fahrzeuge mit Erkennung von Kurven und Leitung der Fahrzeuge mittels Sprache | [1994/04] | English: | Vehicle-guiding device for recognizing curved road and leading vehicle along curved road aurally | [1994/04] | French: | Dispositif de navigation pour véhicules avec reconnaissance de courbes et guidage auditif de véhicules | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98114209.4 / EP0877348 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0487280 (FUJITSU TEN LTD [JP]) | [X] - VEHICLE NAVIGATION & INFORMATION SYSTEMS; VNIS '89, SEPTEMBER 11- 13,1989 IEEE US pages 146 - 150 DAVIS ET AL 'The Back Seat Driver: Real Time Spoken Driving Instructions' | Examination | - James Davis; "Back Seat Driver: voice assisted automobile navigation." PhD thesis, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, September 1989 |