EP0584528 - Lid assembly for lead/accumulator with venting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accumulatorenwerke Hoppecke Carl Zoellner & Sohn GmbH & Co. KG Bontkirchener Strasse 1 Postfach 1140 D-59914 Brilon / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states Accumulatorenwerke Hoppecke Carl Zoellner & Sohn GmbH & Co. KG Bontkirchener Strasse 1 Postfach 1140 D-59914 Brilon / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampe, Werner Am Weiher 43 D-3538 Marsberg 12 / DE | 02 /
Scholz, Peter Dominitstrasse 5 D-5790 Brilon 2 / DE | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111619.8 | 21.07.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | DE19920009986U | 24.07.1992 Original published format: DE 9209986 U | [1994/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584528 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584528 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12, H01M2/04 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
H01M50/147 (EP,US);
H01M50/35 (EP,US);
H01M50/668 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/09] | Title | German: | Deckel für Bleiakkumulator mit Entgasungssystem | [1994/09] | English: | Lid assembly for lead/accumulator with venting system | [1994/09] | French: | Couvercle pour accumulateur au plomb comportant un système de purge des gaz | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE VB Autobatterie GMBH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Dieter Ralf Patentassessor, Carl-Orff-Weg 20 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [1996/39] | 11.09.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.09.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 04.08.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191501525 (JOEL HENRY FRANCIS) [A] 7 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 6; figure 1 * * &GB-A-01525 A.D. 1915 *; | [A]US2221542 (HOPKINS MARK A) [A] * figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR1093637 (CIE FRANCAISE D ACCUMULATEURS) [A] 7 * page 2, column L, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1262239 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] * page 2, line 26 - line 78; figure 2 *; | [A]DE8007719U (ACCUMULATORENWERK HOPPECKE CARL ZOELLNER & SOHN) [A] 1,7 * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,4,5; claims 1,5,7 *; | [AD]EP0178422 (HOPPECKE ZOELLNER SOHN ACCU [DE]); | [A]US4851305 (KUMP WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4916034 (HULSEBUS RANDY K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 31 - line 52; figure 4 *; | [XP]DE9209986U (ACCUMULATORENWERKE HOPPECKE CARL ZOELLNER & SOHN GMBH) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * |