EP0580170 - Device for washing patients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAYL-MEDIZINTECHNIK GmbH Hoffnungsthaler Strasse 47 D-51503 Rösrath / DE | [1994/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aydnik, Heinz Hoffnungsthaler Strasse 47 D-51503 Rösrath / DE | 02 /
Hartung, Bernd Waldweg 43 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | 03 /
Brück, K. Gernot Diepenbeekallee 2 D-50858 Köln / DE | 04 /
Tekaat, Gerd Jürgen Am Bienengarten 1 D-51503 Rösrath / DE | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, et al Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 D-51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111838.4 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | DE19924224446 | 24.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224446 | [1994/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580170 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580170 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
A61G7/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/04] | Title | German: | Krankenwaschvorrichtung | [1994/04] | English: | Device for washing patients | [1994/04] | French: | Dispositif pour laver les malades | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1994 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 03.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.09.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   22.09.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.1998 | 31.07.1998 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.1999 | 31.07.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.02.2000 | FR | 02.02.2000 | GB | 02.02.2000 | IT | 02.02.2000 | NL | 02.02.2000 | SE | 02.05.2000 | AT | 23.07.2000 | LU | 23.07.2000 | BE | 31.07.2000 | CH | 31.07.2000 | LI | 31.07.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 02.02.2000 | |
FR | 02.02.2000 | ||
GB | 02.02.2000 | ||
NL | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
AT | 23.07.2000 | ||
LU | 23.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
CH | 31.07.2000 | ||
LI | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | ES | 02.02.2000 | |
GB | 02.02.2000 | ||
NL | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 23.07.2000 | ||
LU | 23.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
CH | 31.07.2000 | ||
LI | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 02.02.2000 | |
GB | 02.02.2000 | ||
NL | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 23.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
CH | 31.07.2000 | ||
LI | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 02.02.2000 | |
GB | 02.02.2000 | ||
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 23.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
CH | 31.07.2000 | ||
LI | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/14] | GB | 02.02.2000 | |
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 23.07.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
CH | 31.07.2000 | ||
LI | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 02.02.2000 | |
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
CH | 31.07.2000 | ||
LI | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 02.02.2000 | |
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
BE | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 02.02.2000 | |
SE | 02.05.2000 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | SE | 02.05.2000 | |
FR | 30.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3557392 (SCHMIDT RICHARD J); | [AD]DE8811746U |