EP0582230 - Ultrasonic motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suganuma, Ryoichi 45-2-404, Nishikubo-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/06] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112235.2 | 30.07.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | JP19920228028 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: JP 22802892 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582230 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582230 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
H02N2/163 (EP,US);
H02N2/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1994/06] | Title | German: | Ultraschallmotor | [1994/06] | English: | Ultrasonic motor | [1994/06] | French: | Moteur à ultrasons | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63174581 ; | [A]US4634915 (MUKOUJIMA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5034646 (SHIRASAKI TAKAYUKI [JP]) |